This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/13/2023 at 09:01:58 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS HOWELL JR, CURTIS WAYNE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HOWELL JR, CURTIS WAYNE. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

HOWELL JR, CURTIS WAYNE

HOWELL, COURTNEY M

MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE JR, CURTIS WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR; HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR; HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC,; MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC,

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC,; MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL, COURTNEY M; HOWELL, COURTNEY M

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL, COURTNEY M; HOWELL, COURTNEY M

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR; HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR

05/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR; HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR

PAID $975.50 ON RECEIPT 2834822, FULLY PAID; $975.50 2834822 Fully Paid

05/17/2023: PAID $975.50 ON RECEIPT 2834822, FULLY PAID; $975.50 2834822 Fully Paid

TEXT; CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

05/16/2023: TEXT; CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF FILING; CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION // ATTACHED

05/16/2023: NOTICE OF FILING; CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION // ATTACHED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR; Text: HOWELL UNKNOWN SPOUSE, CURTIS WAYNE JR 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,; Text: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,; Text: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC, / 06/01/2023; Text: MONTVERDE MOBILE HOME SUBDIVISION ASSOCIATION INC, 06/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOWELL, COURTNEY M / 05/30/2023; Text: HOWELL, COURTNEY M 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR / 05/30/2023; Text: HOWELL, CURTIS WAYNE JR 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Overage Fee; Amount Paid: 2.0; Due Date: 2023-06-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Refund under $10.00; Due Date: 2023-06-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $973.50 ON RECEIPT 2834822, FULLY PAID; Text: $973.50 2834822 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2834822; Text: 2834822

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Book: 6144; Page: 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less