This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/18/2020 at 07:31:34 (UTC).

BITTING, KIMBERLY R, BITTING, KIMBERLY R Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2013 BITTING, KIMBERLY R, BITTING, KIMBERLY R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

BITTING, KIMBERLY R

Decedent

SELLERS, JOE HARVEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

TAYLOR, L. E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2014

DocketDescription: ORDER OF DISCHARGE; Text: ORDER OF DISCHARGE COPY SENT, ENV PROVIDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2014

DocketDescription: REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION; Text: REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2014

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: COVER LETTER DATED 07-10-14 FROM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; Text: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING; PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;; Text: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING; PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - BITTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: PROOF OF SERVICE; Text: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: NOTICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS; Text: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2014

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: COVER LETTER DATED 06-19-14 FROM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2014

DocketDescription: SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM; Text: SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - BANK OF AMERICA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY; Text: PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD - REAL PROPERTY; Text: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE; Text: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Text: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Text: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT **ORIGINAL RECEIVED 10-03-13 - 5 PAGES - SELF PROVED**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: FILING FEE ASSESSED - FORMAL ADMINSTRATION; Text: FILING FEE ASSESSED - FORMAL ADMINSTRATION Receipt: 332920 Date: 10/01/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Text: DEATH CERTIFICATE DOD: 08/27/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2014

FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 3.0; Amount Paid: 3.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2013

FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 14.0; Amount Paid: 14.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less