This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 00:10:47 (UTC).

CANO, TEESA VS LUCROY, TERESA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 CANO, TEESA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUCROY, TERESA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, TERRY T and PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEAL, TERRY T

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANO, TEESA

Defendant

LUCROY, TERESA

 

Court Documents

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

03/18/2021: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LUCROY, TERESA / 02/05/2021; LUCROY, TERESA 02/05/2021

02/08/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LUCROY, TERESA / 02/05/2021; LUCROY, TERESA 02/05/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LUCROY, TERESA; LUCROY, TERESA CERTIFIED MAIL

02/02/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO LUCROY, TERESA; LUCROY, TERESA CERTIFIED MAIL

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

10/19/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/19/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CHECK LIST; FOR SMALL CLAIMS CASES

10/19/2020: CHECK LIST; FOR SMALL CLAIMS CASES

PAID $198.62 ON RECEIPT 2591816, FULLY PAID; $198.62 2591816 Fully Paid

10/19/2020: PAID $198.62 ON RECEIPT 2591816, FULLY PAID; $198.62 2591816 Fully Paid

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: CRP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/27/2021 BEGINNING AT 3:15 PM; Text: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) 4/27/2021 3:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: SET FOR 042721 @ 3:15PM / PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LUCROY, TERESA / 02/05/2021; Text: LUCROY, TERESA 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO LUCROY, TERESA; Text: LUCROY, TERESA CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 3/17/2021 BEGINNING AT 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 3/17/2021 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-38-A DATED DECEMBER 14, 2020; Text: NEAL, TERRY T PEPPERMAN, CARLA R Per Admin Order L-2020-38-A dated December 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 6.72; Amount Paid: 6.72; Due Date: 2020-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.9; Amount Paid: 6.9; Due Date: 2020-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2020-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST; Text: FOR SMALL CLAIMS CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $198.62 ON RECEIPT 2591816, FULLY PAID; Text: $198.62 2591816 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less