This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 12/27/2022 at 09:09:55 (UTC).

BURGER, DONALD ANTHONY, HOKE, MELINDA CELIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 BURGER, DONALD ANTHONY, HOKE, MELINDA CELIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZ, LARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZ, LARRY

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

HOKE, MELINDA CELIA

Decedent

BURGER, DONALD ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate/Guardianship Services Charges; Amount Due: 3.0; Amount Paid: 3.0; Due Date: 2022-12-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 2792732, FULLY PAID; Text: $3.00 2792732 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: COPY REQUEST; Text: CC SO W.SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Book: 6068; Page: 506

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Book: 6068; Page: 501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED; Text: SELF PROVEN; Book: 6068; Page: 502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Formal Administration; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2022-11-30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2787221, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2787221 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less