This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 11/10/2019 at 17:14:46 (UTC).

BILL RHODES HONEY COMPANY; DBA Et Al VS KUSTOM SPRING & ALIGHNMENT;

Case Summary

On 07/25/2000 BILL RHODES HONEY COMPANY DBA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KUSTOM SPRING ALIGHNMENT. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RHODES, BILL

BILL RHODES HONEY COMPANY; DBA

Defendant

KUSTOM SPRING & ALIGHNMENT;

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; COPY CK#086653 TO BILL RHODES FOR $7838.14 / 49112

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; (COPY) CK REQUEST FOR $7838.14 #49112 TO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; ORDER DISCHARGING SECTION 559.917 BOND & DIRECTING DISBURSAL OF BOND PROCEEDS TO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; PLTF'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE OF BOND (FILED BY ATTY WILLIAM KING) ORDER FWD TO JUDGE MILLER FOR REVIEW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; THE AMOUNT OF $7838.14 WAS PUT IN THE REGISTRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2000

DocketTIME OF CONVERSION; CERTIFICATE OF MVRA ISS TO LIENEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less