This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/22/2023 at 14:06:58 (UTC).

BERNATH, MARGO, BERNATH, MARGO Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 BERNATH, MARGO, BERNATH, MARGO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

BERNATH, MARGO

Decedent

ROTKER, MARI C

Interested Party

ROTKER, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHULTE, KIMBERLY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2022

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022

DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Book: 5991; Page: 2459

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Book: 5991; Page: 2453

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED; Text: NOT SELF PROVED; Book: 5991; Page: 2454

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

DocketDescription: OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: COMMISSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Formal Administration; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2022-03-16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2722345, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2722345 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less