This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 11/19/2019 at 02:42:49 (UTC).

BELSON-HOCKING AKA VERNA KNIFFEN AKA VERNA YAMAMOTO, VERNA ANN, HOCKING, THOMAS M Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2013 BELSON-HOCKING AKA VERNA KNIFFEN AKA VERNA YAMAMOTO, VERNA ANN, HOCKING, THOMAS M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

HOCKING, THOMAS M

Decedent

BELSON-HOCKING AKA VERNA KNIFFEN AKA VERNA YAMAMOTO, VERNA ANN

Interested Party

KNIFFEN, MICHAEL J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

SEWELL, STEPHEN G

Interested Party Attorney

GARNER, GREGORY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/31/2015

DocketDISMISSED, SETTLED OR DISPOSED BEFORE HEARING; Dismissed, Settled Or Disposed Before Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015

DocketREPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SEWELL, STEPHEN G; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SEWELL, STEPHEN G

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015

DocketPETITIONER: HOCKING, THOMAS M; Petitioner: HOCKING, THOMAS M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015

DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE; COPY SENT; ENV PROVIDED; Book: 4723; Page: 963

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

DocketCOVER LETTER DATED; 12/16/15 FROM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2015

DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2015

DocketREPORT OF DISTRIBUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2015

DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING; PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;; FROM MICHAEL KNIFFEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2015

DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING; PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;; FROM CLINT KNIFFEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2015

DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING; PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;; FROM THOMAS HOCKING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
06/19/2013

DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - CLINT E. KNIFFEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE; OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE; OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

Docket# OF PAGES WITH CERTIFIED COPIES; # OF PAGES WITH CERTIFIED COPIES Receipt: 323637 Date: 06/20/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketCERTIFYING COPIES / PROBATE; CERTIFYING COPIES / PROBATE Receipt: 323637 Date: 06/20/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketFILING FEE ASSESSED - FORMAL ADMINSTRATION; FILING FEE ASSESSED - FORMAL ADMINSTRATION Receipt: 323637 Date: 06/20/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - INTESTATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2013

FinancialConversion Fee; Amount Due: $12.0; Amount Paid: $12.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2013

FinancialConversion Fee; Amount Due: $404.0; Amount Paid: $404.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less