This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 00:45:36 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK VS MUNOZ, EDWARD

Case Summary

On 03/20/2009 ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MUNOZ, EDWARD. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BANK

Defendant

MUNOZ, EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLED, CHRISTIAN D

7765 S W 87 Avenue, Suite 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE; PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE IN THE AMT OF $100 / PAYABLE TO PLTF / GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC / RCT #247649; $100.00 to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

09/07/2012: PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE; PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE IN THE AMT OF $100 / PAYABLE TO PLTF / GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC / RCT #247649; $100.00 to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE; GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE Receipt: 247649 Date: 12/08/2010 GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC.

12/08/2010: GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE; GARNISHMENT ATTORNEY FEE Receipt: 247649 Date: 12/08/2010 GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT; Text: / GARNISHEE: VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Text: VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RET; Text: SERVED 121117 / GARNISHEE: VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Text: / GARNISHEE: VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED AND; Text: TO DEFT EDWARD MUNOZ/ CC MAILED TO ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC WITH NTD AND COE / GARNISHEE VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Garnishment Fee; Amount Due: 85.0; Amount Paid: 85.0; Due Date: 2017-11-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDescription: PAID $85.00 ON RECEIPT 2301974, FULLY PAID; Text: $85.00 2301974 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Text: GARNISHEE: VALENCIA COLLEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE; Text: PAYOUT OF GARNISHMENT FEE IN THE AMT OF $100 / PAYABLE TO PLTF / GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC / RCT #247649; $100.00 to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketDescription: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED AND RECORDED; Text: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE / GARNISHEE E.M INVESTIGATIONS, INC. / RCT #247649/ FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: (JCW) ATTY ED MATZ PRES FOR PLTF / DEF NOT PRES / DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / ATTY TO SUBMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO PARTY/ DATE; Text: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SERVING THE IND ON 032509 / MEDIATION ON 042909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED AND DEL TO LCSO; Text: SUMMONS ISSUED EDWARD MUNOZ AND DELIVERED TO THE LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE FOR MEDAITION ON 042909 AT 9 45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: MEDIATION HEARING SET; Text: MEDIATION HEARING SET Event: MEDIATION (SC/CC) Date: 04/29/2009 Time: 9:45 am Judge: MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS) Location: JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: ISSUING SUMMONS / COUNTY CIVIL; Text: ISSUING SUMMONS / COUNTY CIVIL Receipt: 184454 Date: 03/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 175.0; Amount Paid: 175.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST; Text: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DocketDescription: FILING FEE ASSESSED - SMALL CLAIMS - $500.01 - $2500.00; Text: FILING FEE ASSESSED - SMALL CLAIMS - $500.01 - $2500.00 Receipt: 184454 Date: 03/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant