This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 04:15:28 (UTC).

ALIMENTI, BERNARD E VS BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 ALIMENTI, BERNARD E filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALIMENTI, BERNARD E

Defendant

BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SLATEN JR, THOMAS R

300 S Orange Avenue, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS; / FILED BY PLTF

04/05/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS; / FILED BY PLTF

MOTION TO DISMISS; PLTF'S COMPLAINT / FILED BY DEFT

04/01/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS; PLTF'S COMPLAINT / FILED BY DEFT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/17/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/17/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

03/17/2020: CHECK LIST

PAID $96.90 ON RECEIPT 2547931, FULLY PAID; $96.90 2547931 Fully Paid

03/17/2020: PAID $96.90 ON RECEIPT 2547931, FULLY PAID; $96.90 2547931 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC,; BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC, CERTIFIED MAIL

03/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC,; BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC, CERTIFIED MAIL

NOTICE OF SERVICE; OF ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE

09/08/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE; OF ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE

COVER LETTER DATED; 082620 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

09/04/2020: COVER LETTER DATED; 082620 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

MOTION; TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE // WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT

08/24/2020: MOTION; TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE // WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; AND COSTS / FILED BY DEFT

07/21/2020: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; AND COSTS / FILED BY DEFT

COVER LETTER DATED; 071020 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

07/15/2020: COVER LETTER DATED; 071020 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

REPLY; TO DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR DENIAL OF DEFT'S ENTITLEMENT TO ATTY FEES AND COURT COSTS ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS

07/03/2020: REPLY; TO DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR DENIAL OF DEFT'S ENTITLEMENT TO ATTY FEES AND COURT COSTS ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS

REPLY; TO PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTY FEES AND COURT COSTS / FILED BY DEFT

07/02/2020: REPLY; TO PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTY FEES AND COURT COSTS / FILED BY DEFT

NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 070920 @ 9:00AM / DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COURT COSTS

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 070920 @ 9:00AM / DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COURT COSTS

RESPONSE; TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COURT COSTS

06/19/2020: RESPONSE; TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COURT COSTS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5488; Page: 703

06/17/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5488; Page: 703

COVER LETTER DATED; 05/12/20 SUBMITTING A PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

05/18/2020: COVER LETTER DATED; 05/12/20 SUBMITTING A PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Text: OF ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE; Book: 5538; Page: 159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 082620 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND DISMISS CASE // WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Text: AND COSTS / FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Text: OF ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES & COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES & COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 071020 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: MH - MOTION HEARING (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: TTN; Notes: M/ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPLY; Text: TO DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR DENIAL OF DEFT'S ENTITLEMENT TO ATTY FEES AND COURT COSTS ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO DISMISS; Text: / FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO DISMISS; Text: PLTF'S COMPLAINT / FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim $100 to $500; Amount Due: 90.0; Amount Paid: 90.0; Due Date: 2020-03-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.9; Amount Paid: 6.9; Due Date: 2020-03-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC,; Text: BOARD OF DIRECTORS HARBOR HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC, CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/22/2020 BEGINNING AT 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 4/22/2020 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $96.90 ON RECEIPT 2547931, FULLY PAID; Text: $96.90 2547931 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLATEN, THOMAS R