This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 00:16:07 (UTC).

44 GABLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS CASSELL, AARON CORDELL Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 44 GABLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASSELL, AARON CORDELL. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

44 GABLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

CASSELL, AARON CORDELL

CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE; CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE

09/19/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE; CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, AARON CORDELL; CASSELL, AARON CORDELL

09/19/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, AARON CORDELL; CASSELL, AARON CORDELL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Book: 5366; Page: 1068

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / STIPULATION TO BE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO CASSELL, AARON CORDELL / 09/23/2019; Text: CASSELL, AARON CORDELL 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE / 09/23/2019; Text: CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE; Text: CASSELL, DORA MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CASSELL, AARON CORDELL; Text: CASSELL, AARON CORDELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 10/30/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 10/30/2019 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 195.0; Amount Paid: 195.0; Due Date: 2019-09-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2493009, FULLY PAID; Text: $195.00 2493009 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less