This case was last updated from Lafayette County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 02:04:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PICON, LUSI

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PICON, LUSI. This case was filed in Lafayette County Courts, Lafayette County Courthouse located in Lafayette, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JACKSON, DARREN KENNETH, JACKSON, DARREN K and DARREN JACKSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lafayette County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lafayette County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lafayette, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JACKSON, DARREN KENNETH

JACKSON, DARREN K

DARREN JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PICON, LUSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/08/2021 10:00; Judge: JACKSON, DARREN K; Docket Type: PRETRIAL; Location: Main Courthouse Location LAFAYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL scheduled on 6/8/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DARREN JACKSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/SIGNED/SEALED AND EAMILED TO ATTORNEY 3-5-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 9641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: JACKSON , DARREN K Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase 342021SC000023SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN