Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Lafayette County Courts on 03/14/2021 at 08:50:24 (UTC).

LAFAYETTE STATE BANK VS EFRID, WILLIAM D

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 LAFAYETTE STATE BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EFRID, WILLIAM D. This case was filed in Lafayette County Courts, Lafayette County Courthouse located in Lafayette, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JACKSON, DARREN KENNETH, JACKSON, DARREN K and DARREN JACKSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lafayette County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lafayette County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lafayette, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JACKSON, DARREN KENNETH

JACKSON, DARREN K

DARREN JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAFAYETTE STATE BANK

Defendant

EFRID, WILLIAM D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/11/2021 10:30; Judge: JACKSON, DARREN K; Docket Type: PRETRIAL; Location: Main Courthouse Location LAFAYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOT FOUND/UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE/SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketActive Process SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL scheduled on 5/11/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge DARREN JACKSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 9564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase 342021SC000016SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: JACKSON , DARREN K assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAFAYETTE STATE BANK is a litigant