This case was last updated from Jefferson County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 02/24/2022 at 15:03:12 (UTC).

MARRINER, STEVEN G II Et Al VS BYLER, ESTHER

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 MARRINER, STEVEN G II filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BYLER, ESTHER. This case was filed in Jefferson County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARRINER, STEVEN G II

SANDERS, TINA

Defendant

BYLER, ESTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, TERESA COOPER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

01/25/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS

01/25/2022:SUMMONS

PETITION

01/25/2022:PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

02/04/2022:UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

02/17/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

NOTICE OF ACTION

02/17/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

02/17/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

02/18/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $415.00 Receipt Number MX 20220337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to STEVEN G MARRINER II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $415.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD , TERESA COOPER