This case was last updated from Jefferson County Florida Courts on 05/06/2022 at 09:16:56 (UTC).

JEFFERSON ARMS APARTMENTS VS KING, KENYATTA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 JEFFERSON ARMS APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KING, KENYATTA. This case was filed in Jefferson County Florida Courts, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PLAINES, ROBERT RIDGELY and PLAINES, ROBERT R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PLAINES, ROBERT RIDGELY

PLAINES, ROBERT R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON ARMS APARTMENTS

Defendant

KING, KENYATTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELL, BRIAN DAVID

Defendant Attorney

BUSH, NICHOLAS GIOVANNI

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/13/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

04/13/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFENDANT RESPONSE

04/21/2021:DEFENDANT RESPONSE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/22/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

06/14/2021:AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; MOTION TO DISMISS; MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT COUNTERCLAIMS AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/06/2021:ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; MOTION TO DISMISS; MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT COUNTERCLAIMS AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MEDIATION REPORT

07/09/2021:MEDIATION REPORT

CLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

07/26/2021:CLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

PLAINTIFFS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY KENYATTA KING

08/09/2021:PLAINTIFFS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY KENYATTA KING

NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/05/2021:NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/05/2021:JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY KENYATTA KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF AGREED ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Nicholas Giovanni Bush Assigned to KENYATTA KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 20211197

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to KENYATTA KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less