This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County on 10/14/2021 at 14:58:22 (UTC).

GRIDER, CATHERINE VS ANSBACH, CAROL Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 GRIDER, CATHERINE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANSBACH, CAROL. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIDER, CATHERINE

Defendants

ANSBACH, CAROL

BANK OF AMERICA NA

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO

Not Classified By Court

ANSBACH, CAROL GRISANTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, TERESA COOPER

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ADVERSE POSSESSION

10/13/2021:AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ADVERSE POSSESSION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

10/12/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL

ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE FANNIE MAE

09/16/2021:ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE FANNIE MAE

SUMMONS ISSUED - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE

09/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE

SUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

09/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

SUMMONS ISSUED - CAROL ANSBACH

09/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED - CAROL ANSBACH

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

09/16/2021:UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

09/16/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ADVERSE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE FANNIE MAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CAROL ANSBACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 20212942

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CATHERINE GRIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD , TERESA COOPER