This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 11/25/2020 at 16:58:50 (UTC).

FOUNTAIN, ROBERT L III, TEXAS HILL INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 FOUNTAIN, ROBERT L III, TEXAS HILL INC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN and DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEXAS HILL INC

Decedent

FOUNTAIN, ROBERT L III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WARD, TERESA COOPER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketEvent HE scheduled on 11/23/2020 at 0345 PM, MX - Judge DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketJOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 20203249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to TEXAS HILL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD , TERESA COOPER