This case was last updated from Jefferson County Florida Courts on 05/02/2022 at 11:05:54 (UTC).

FERRELL, KRISTOPHER M, SINGLETARY, MARGIE ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 FERRELL, KRISTOPHER M, SINGLETARY, MARGIE ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Florida Courts, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERRELL, KRISTOPHER M

Decedent

SINGLETARY, MARGIE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WARD, TERESA COOPER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number MX 20213002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to KRISTOPHER M FERRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD , TERESA COOPER