This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County on 05/05/2022 at 05:27:01 (UTC).

CLARK, JOSEPH VS BANEY, DAVE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 CLARK, JOSEPH filed an Other lawsuit against BANEY, DAVE. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, JOSEPH

Defendants

BANEY, DAVE

RICKETT, KRISTINE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/04/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

11/04/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/04/2021:SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE

11/04/2021:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE

CLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

11/09/2021:CLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

SUMMONS ISSUED - DAVE BANEY

11/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED - DAVE BANEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - KRISTINE RICKETT

11/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED - KRISTINE RICKETT

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

11/19/2021:UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED - NO CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY AND UNOFFICIAL DOCUMENTS

11/29/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED - NO CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY AND UNOFFICIAL DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/01/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD

12/09/2021:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD

MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DAVE BANEY

12/14/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DAVE BANEY

MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT KRISTINE RICKETT

12/14/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT KRISTINE RICKETT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/28/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT KRISTINE RICKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DAVE BANEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED - NO CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY AND UNOFFICIAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KRISTINE RICKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - DAVE BANEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less