This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 06/10/2019 at 15:28:21 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE VS LOJAN, JOHN

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOJAN, JOHN. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PLAINES, ROBERT R and ROBERT PLAINES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jefferson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jefferson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PLAINES, ROBERT R

ROBERT PLAINES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE

Defendant

LOJAN, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

05/17/2019:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/17/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/17/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Event CIVIL PT scheduled on 7/1/2019 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT PLAINES presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 20192283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event Date: 07/01/2019 14:00; Judge: PLAINES, ROBERT R; Docket Type: CIVIL PT; Location: MX COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.