This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 06/10/2019 at 15:28:16 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS JONES, DORA A

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, DORA A. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PLAINES, ROBERT R and ROBERT PLAINES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jefferson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jefferson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PLAINES, ROBERT R

ROBERT PLAINES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JONES, DORA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, KARLA M

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

05/17/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS

05/17/2019:SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/17/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/17/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Event CIVIL PT scheduled on 7/1/2019 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT PLAINES presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 20192282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event Date: 07/01/2019 14:00; Judge: PLAINES, ROBERT R; Docket Type: CIVIL PT; Location: MX COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.