This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County on 09/21/2020 at 12:02:48 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS MCLEMORE, JEFFREY T

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCLEMORE, JEFFREY T. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County, Jefferson County Courthouse located in Jefferson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Second Circuit Courts - Jefferson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jefferson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CALOCA-JOHNSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

MCLEMORE, JEFFREY T

Not Classified By Court

MCLEMORE, JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

07/09/2020:PLAINTIFFS NOTICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

07/09/2020:STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

07/06/2020:NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/17/2020:PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/10/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF DEFENDNAT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE REGARDING INCOME AND ASSETS EXEMPT FROM GARNISHMENT

02/10/2020:DECLARATION OF DEFENDNAT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE REGARDING INCOME AND ASSETS EXEMPT FROM GARNISHMENT

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

02/10/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

01/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/17/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

12/17/2019:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DEFENDNAT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE REGARDING INCOME AND ASSETS EXEMPT FROM GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT - JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JEFFREY T MCLEMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 20195840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK FKA AMERICAN EXPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less