This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:47:52 (UTC).

WYNN, JOHN M VS JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 WYNN, JOHN M filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYNN, JOHN M

Defendant

JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTOX, MARIE A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

07/14/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

COMPLAINT

07/13/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF READINESS FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008766

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to JOHN M WYNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: 7/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:7/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000149CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTOX, MARIE A