This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:45:00 (UTC).

WRIGHT, LASHANARRIAN LAQUETIA VS LASTER, REBECCA LORRAINE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 WRIGHT, LASHANARRIAN LAQUETIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LASTER, REBECCA LORRAINE. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, JAMES GOODMAN JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

JAMES GOODMAN JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WRIGHT, LASHANARRIAN LAQUETIA

Respondent

LASTER, REBECCA LORRAINE

Not Classified By Court

WRIGHT, LASHANARRIAN

MCCALISTER, REBECCA LORRAINE

LASTER, REBECCA L

WRIGHT, LASHANNARRIAN LAQUITIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ODPT sent to JCSO for information only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCLERK MINUTE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Spoke with petitoner by phone (3:12 PM) and reminded her that she had not picked up copies of the OSH with hearing information.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: 8/20/21 (OSH) by JCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDEPUTY WORKSHEET: 8/20/21 (OSH) by JCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET: OSH sent to JCSO for service to respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent DV HEARINGS scheduled on 9/1/2021 at 1110 AM, MX - Judge JAMES GOODMAN JR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING WITHOUT ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION: SEPTEMBER 1, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO PETITIONER REGARDING CONTACT NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE (color0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE (b & w)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase 322021DR000115DVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less