This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/05/2022 at 05:05:11 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, ENOCH E VS BARNES, KIRIE

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 WILLIAMS, ENOCH E filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARNES, KIRIE. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, ENOCH E

Defendant

BARNES, KIRIE

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

03/07/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/16/2022 13:30; Judge: MERCER, WADE; Docket Type: HEARING - SC/CTY CIV; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCLERK MINUTE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING - SC/CTY CIV scheduled on 2/16/2022 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL AND TRIAL INSTRUCTIONS 2/16/2022 @ 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/18/2021 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE/PAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE AFTER MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: KIRIE BARNES - 11-18-2021 @ 10 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 11/18/2021 at 1000 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021011848

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000551SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less