This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:33:19 (UTC).

WALKER, LIVYAR VS FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 WALKER, LIVYAR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER, LIVYAR

Defendant

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN, YITZHAK SHMUEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/30/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/30/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED:6/30/2021

06/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED:6/30/2021

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/30/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

06/30/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

RECEIPT

06/30/2021:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008222

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LIVYAR WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000139CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVIN , YITZHAK S