This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/11/2019 at 19:02:30 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA VS CHRISTMAS, MELISSA L

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHRISTMAS, MELISSA L. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

CHRISTMAS, MELISSA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

ANGULO, VANESSA CORZO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 8/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 8/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 8/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 8/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Payment received: $40.00 Receipt Number CA 2019002251

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $40.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORDED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Payment received: $914.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $914.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $914.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to MELISSA L CHRISTMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case 322019CA000352CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGULO, VANESSA CORZO