This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/01/2019 at 19:00:32 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN VS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT A WEA Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT A WEA. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN

Defendants

WEAVER, ROBERT A

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT A WEA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REIDER, DAVID LOUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO FURNITURE INSIDE OF RESIDENCE; NO NEIGHBORS AT HOME TO ASK WHEREABOUTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE-SERVED: TINA HOLLAND AS CO-RESIDENT 7/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO FURNITURE INSIDE OF RESIDENCE; NO NEIGHBORS AT HOME TO ASK WHEREABOUTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO FURNITURE INSIDE OF RESIDENCE; NO NEIGHBORS AT HOME TO ASK WHEREABOUTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $445.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $445.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH RURAL HOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $445.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 322019CA000342CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reider, David L