This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:30:01 (UTC).

TYNDALL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS KELLEY, MARLA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TYNDALL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against KELLEY, MARLA M. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYNDALL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KELLEY, TYLER LAMAR

KELLEY, MARLA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORSILLO, STEPHEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/06/2020 14:00; Judge: MERCER, WADE; Docket Type: HEARING - SC/CTY CIV; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING - SC/CTY CIV on 2/6/2020 0200 PM Judge WADE MERCER results CANCELLED on 1/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 2/6/2020 @ 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING - SC/CTY CIV scheduled on 2/6/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO PATRICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $405.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $405.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $405.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to TYNDALL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000771CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less