This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:22:39 (UTC).

THARPE, RONNIE LEE VS DAWKINS, DONNELL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 THARPE, RONNIE LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAWKINS, DONNELL. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THARPE, RONNIE LEE

Defendant

DAWKINS, DONNELL

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE

01/24/2020:STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/10/2020 11:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 9/10/2020 at 1100 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION 09-10-2020 @ 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/22/2020 13:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JACKSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/20/2020 13:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO on 7/22/2020 0130 PM Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION results CANCELLED on 5/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCANCELLATION LETTER FOR MEDIATION SENT TO ATTORNEY (E-FILED) AND/OR MAILED TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketGREEN CARD RETURNED SIGNED BY D DAWKINS CV RR01 C-19 4-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketGREEN CARD RETURNED SIGNED R T CG/C-19/R 31 - 4-21-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number TR 2019005899

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON: 12/5/2019 HANDED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000767SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less