This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 08/25/2022 at 23:09:08 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS HAGANS, ANNETTE B

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAGANS, ANNETTE B. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and MERCER, DOUGLAS WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

MERCER, DOUGLAS WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

HAGANS, ANNETTE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/07/2022 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANNETTE HAGANS 8/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 9/7/2022 at 1000 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022007445

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase 322022SC000371SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J