Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 02/20/2021 at 23:05:31 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS DUTCH, LINDA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUTCH, LINDA. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

DUTCH, LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/18/2021 14:40; Judge: MERCER, WADE; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 2/18/2021 @ 2:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED: LINDA DUTCH - 1/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 2/18/2021 at 0240 PM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA DUTCH - 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000766

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000033SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J