This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/02/2022 at 09:59:52 (UTC).

SELLERS, LAYURA ANNETTE VS SELLERS, MICHAEL JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 SELLERS, LAYURA ANNETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SELLERS, MICHAEL JAMES. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GARCIA, ANA MARIA and GARCIA JR, ANA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA JR, ANA M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SELLERS, LAYURA ANNETTE

Respondent

SELLERS, MICHAEL JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ISSUED: 2/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION IN THE JACKSON COUNTY TIMES 12/23/21, 12/30/21, 1/6/22, AND 1/13/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE - NOTARIZED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJUDGE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA JR, ANA M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION:12/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER SUBJECT'S BROTHER, ANTHONY, SUBJECT IS IN THE HOSPITAL IN TEXAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 322021DR000298DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less