This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 12/20/2019 at 19:03:16 (UTC).

SANABRIA ALLEN, CHRISTINA VS INFINITY CHEER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SANABRIA ALLEN, CHRISTINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INFINITY CHEER COMPANY. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANABRIA ALLEN, CHRISTINA

Defendants

INFINITY CHEER COMPANY

JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

MOORE, JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARDENBOROUGH, HAROLD R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CINDY JAMES AT JCSB 12/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CHRISTINA SANABRIA ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CA000649CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less