This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 19:11:00 (UTC).

ROBINSON, AUDREY VS WALMART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 ROBINSON, AUDREY filed an Other lawsuit against WALMART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA and GARCIA, ANA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON, AUDREY

Defendant

WALMART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAIS, NICOLE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/30/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

COMPLAINT

06/30/2022:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA , ANA M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006436

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to AUDREY ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: 7/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000119CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAIS, NICOLE ELIZABETH