This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:31:22 (UTC).

RICE, CHARLENE VS WHITEHURST, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 RICE, CHARLENE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WHITEHURST, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICE, CHARLENE

Defendant

WHITEHURST, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: ELIZABETH WHITEHURST 1-4-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $19.00 Receipt Number CC 2019000410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $19.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 12-30-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMING AMOUNT OF RENT TO BE PLACED INTO COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEF WITH MOTION SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number TR 2019005983

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON: 12/9/2019 HANDED TO DEF FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000785CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less