This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/26/2022 at 19:16:54 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC VS GOODSON, NINA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GOODSON, NINA M. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA, GARCIA, ANA M, JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER and JOHNSON, DAVID C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER

JOHNSON, DAVID C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

Defendants

GOODSON, NINA M

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NINA M GOODS

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/27/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

LIS PENDENS

06/27/2022:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

06/27/2022:COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: NINA M GOODSON - 6/27/2022

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: NINA M GOODSON - 6/27/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT C/O U.S. ATTORNEY NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA - 6/27/2022

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT C/O U.S. ATTORNEY NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA - 6/27/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NINA M. GOODSON - 6/27/2022

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NINA M. GOODSON - 6/27/2022

RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/30/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketUNITED STATES' ANSWER - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: JOHNSON , DAVID C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:MELISSA RUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED:NOT FOUND-JAMES GOODSON-DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:INDIVIDUAL-NINA GOODSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: NINA M. GOODSON 7-1-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NINA M. GOODSON 7-1-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA. STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $944.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $944.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $944.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000111CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant