This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/09/2022 at 19:12:27 (UTC).

Regions Bank Dba Regions Mortg VS AGRI AFC LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Regions Bank Dba Regions Mortg filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AGRI AFC LLC. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER, JOHNSON, DAVID C, GARCIA, ANA M and GARCIA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER

JOHNSON, DAVID C

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regions Bank Dba Regions Mortg

Defendants

TAYLOR, SCOTT

CROP PRODUCTION SERVICES INC

NEEL, LINDA TAYLOR

AGRI AFC LLC

Unknown Spouse Of Linda Taylor

TAYLOR, JENNIFER

Truist Bank

Marianna Auto Parts Supply In

Packaging Corporation Of Ameri

Ford Motor Credit Company Llc

One South Bank Nka One Florida

Unknown Tenant 1

Unknown Tenant 2

TRISTATES AUTOMOTIVE WAREHOUSE

Not Classified By Court

A. HENDERSON, F/K/A LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUMAN, ROD BARRETT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/09/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

06/09/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

LIS PENDENS

06/09/2022:LIS PENDENS

RECORDED LIS PENDENS

06/13/2022:RECORDED LIS PENDENS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A. - 6/14/2022

06/22/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A. - 6/14/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT TRI-STATES AUTOMOTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JENNIFER TAYLOR - 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIANNA AUTO PARTS & SUPPLY, INC C/O MARY C STEVENS, P.A. - 6/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A. - 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, R.A. - 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CROP PRODUCTION SERVICE, INC N/K/A NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS, R.A. - 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ONE SOUTH BANK NKA ONE FLORIDA BANK C/O RICK PULLUM PRESIDENT - 6/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SCOTT BACALUSKI 6/15/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRITTNEY DOTY AS SERVICE LIAISON 6/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,044.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $1,044.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,044.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to Regions Bank Dba Regions Mortgage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000102CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where AGRI AFC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crop Production Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant