This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:47:29 (UTC).

PYBUS, LUDON VS OM SAI 4 LLC DBA SUPER 8 BY WY

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 PYBUS, LUDON filed an Other lawsuit against OM SAI 4 LLC DBA SUPER 8 BY WY. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PYBUS, LUDON

Defendant

OM SAI 4 LLC DBA SUPER 8 BY WY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGLUND, JEFFREY ALAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/23/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

07/23/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED 7/23/21

07/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED 7/23/21

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

07/23/2021:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

07/23/2021:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 7/23/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021009180

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LUDON PYBUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000153CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGLUND, JEFFREY ALAN