This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:32:23 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS TYUS, DEMETRIUS E

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against TYUS, DEMETRIUS E. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

TYUS, DEMETRIUS E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2020007853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED DELIVERED TO: DEMETRIUS E TYUS 8-3-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS UNSERVED: DEMETRIUS E TYUS 2-11-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2020001353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DELIVERED TO DEMETRIUS E TYUS 2-5-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEMETRIUS TYUS 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000784CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less