This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:24:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS SCHULTE, SUZANNE J

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHULTE, SUZANNE J. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

SCHULTE, SUZANNE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL MEDIATION PER MEDIATION DOCKET

01/29/2020:DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL MEDIATION PER MEDIATION DOCKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/29/2020 08:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: TELEPHONE MEDIATION; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JACKSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL MEDIATION PER MEDIATION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event TELEPHONE MEDIATION on 1/29/2020 0830 AM Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION results CANCELLED on 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE J SCHULTE 12-14-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEvent TELEPHONE MEDIATION scheduled on 1/29/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SUZANNE J SCHULTE 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000792SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less