This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:23:15 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS RUSS, MITTIE

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUSS, MITTIE. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

RUSS, MITTIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

MEDIATED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE AND APPROVING STIPULATION BEFORE JUDGES SIGNATURE

01/29/2020:MEDIATED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE AND APPROVING STIPULATION BEFORE JUDGES SIGNATURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE AND APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CAUSE AND APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/29/2020 08:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: TELEPHONE MEDIATION; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JACKSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE AND APPROVING STIPULATION BEFORE JUDGES SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MITTIE RUSS 12-14-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEvent TELEPHONE MEDIATION scheduled on 1/29/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MITTIE RUSS 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003442

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000777SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less