This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:24:21 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PULLAM, CHASITY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PULLAM, CHASITY. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

PULLAM, CHASITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FICKER, CHRISTINE MARY

 

Court Documents

RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

02/07/2020:RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL MEDIATION PER MEDIATION DOCKET

01/24/2020:DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL MEDIATION PER MEDIATION DOCKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE AND ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MEETING OF CREDITORS TO BE HELD BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - UNITED STATES BANKRUTCY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE MEANS OF FINAL DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEvent SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/6/19 FOR PRETRIAL MEDIATION 1/22/20 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003437

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000773SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less