This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:30:39 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS CURRY, JOHNNY D JR

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against CURRY, JOHNNY D JR. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

CURRY, JOHNNY D JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT, LADRAY BRANDAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2020003578

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/25/2020 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: TELEPHONE MEDIATION; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE COUNTY; Defendant Attorney: GILBERT, LADRAY B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE INVOICE FOR PROGRAM MEDIATION SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION AND ORDER SETTING MEDIATION 3-25-2020 @ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEvent TELEPHONE MEDIATION scheduled on 3/25/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketANSWER SENT TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketANSWER DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHNNY CURRY ON 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003447

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000782CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less