This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:32:15 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS BROWN, LAWRENCE D

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against BROWN, LAWRENCE D. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

BROWN, LAWRENCE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LAWRENCE D BROWN 12-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED 1-24-2020, MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LAWRENCE D BROWN 12-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO LAWRENCE D BROWN 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000783CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less