This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 09/30/2021 at 05:22:00 (UTC).

PEACE, ADRIAN SR VS METRIC ENGINEERING INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 PEACE, ADRIAN SR filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against METRIC ENGINEERING INC. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEACE, ADRIAN SR

Defendants

METRIC ENGINEERING INC

THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTOX, MARIE A

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE: METRIC ENGINEERING, LLC C/O MARILEY PEREZ - REGISTERED AGENT - 6/3/2021

06/14/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE: METRIC ENGINEERING, LLC C/O MARILEY PEREZ - REGISTERED AGENT - 6/3/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

05/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

SUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

05/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/28/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

05/28/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: METRIC ENGINEERING, LLC C/O MARILEY PEREZ - REGISTERED AGENT - 6/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021006651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to ADRIAN PEACE SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000093CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMPSON TRUCKING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Metric Engineering, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTOX, MARIE A