This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 16:03:28 (UTC).

OLIVE, ASHLEY W VS DRAWDY, CAROL ANN

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 OLIVE, ASHLEY W filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DRAWDY, CAROL ANN. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVE, ASHLEY W

Defendant

DRAWDY, CAROL ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: - POSTED - CAROL ANN DRAWDRY 9-14-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketANSWER FROM CAROL ANN DRAWDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: AMENDED - CAROL ANN DRAWDY 9-9-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $17.00 Receipt Number MX 2020009428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $17.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2020008840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CAROL ANN DRAWDY 8-24-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase 322020CC000561CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less