This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 08/19/2022 at 16:06:08 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS TOWSON, LOUIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TOWSON, LOUIS. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, DOUGLAS WADE and MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, DOUGLAS WADE

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

TOWSON, LOUIS

Unknown Spouse Of Louis Towson

Unknown Parties In Possession

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

07/20/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/22/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NOT FOUND, 8-6-22, LOUIS TOWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NOT FOUND, 8-6-22, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LOUIS TOWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NOT FOUND, 8-2-22, UNKNOWN TENANT #2, LOUIS TOWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NOT FOUND, 8-2-22, UNKNOWN TENANT #1, LOUIS TOWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: 7/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: 7/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $349.00 Receipt Number MX 2022007173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $349.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $349.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CC000355CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN