This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 19:12:59 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA and GARCIA, ANA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

RABON, JASON W

RABON, TINA M

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JASON W RABO

MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, JOHN YOUNG

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

06/29/2022:LIS PENDENS

Verification of Mortgage Complaint

06/29/2022:Verification of Mortgage Complaint

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/29/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/06/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

06/29/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

06/29/2022:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT TRI STATES AUTOMATIVE

07/12/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT TRI STATES AUTOMATIVE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

07/19/2022:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

07/22/2022:AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: JOHN Y ROBERTS Assigned to MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT TRI STATES AUTOMATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA , ANA M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification of Mortgage Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $954.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $954.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $954.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000117CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARIANNA AUTO PARTS AND SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan