This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 12:29:42 (UTC).

MORRIS, DOROTHY, MORRIS, HARMON EUGENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MORRIS, DOROTHY, MORRIS, HARMON EUGENE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS, DOROTHY

Not Classified By Court

MORRIS, HARMON EUGENE

Decedent

PURVIS, BEAMON M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRISTER, TODD CLIFFORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRECORDED AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINSTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRECORDED AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketReopened for Civil Other on 5/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketPETITION (AMENDED) TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION GREATER $1000.00 FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney: TODD C BRISTER Assigned to DOROTHY MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CP000342PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less