This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:33:45 (UTC).

MORALES, JAIME A Et Al VS ALTMAN, FRANCES Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 MORALES, JAIME A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALTMAN, FRANCES. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR, GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and JAMES GOODMAN JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

JAMES GOODMAN JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORALES, RAMON F

MORALES, JAIME A

Defendants

ALTMAN, FRANCES

SELLERS, LAVERNE

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA CE

OLIPHANT FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILTON, A CLAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/30/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/01/2021:RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/12/2021 09:45; Judge: GOODMAN, JAMES J JR; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: SEE INSTRUCTIONS ZOOM V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 10/12/2021 at 0945 AM, ZM - Judge JAMES GOODMAN JR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/12/21 AT 9:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND ADVANCED COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION IN THE JACKSON COUNTY TIMES 8/19, 8/26, 9/2, AND 9/9/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED 8/11/21 - NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED FOR PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/30/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/30/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to JAIME A MORALES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to RAMON F MORALES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000135CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLIPHANT FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILTON, A CLAY